Name, ID and tenure
Sequential |
Name |
Duration |
01 |
Mr. Chir Ranjan Barua |
10/04/1983 to 01/12/1985 AD |
02 |
Mr. SA Karim |
01/12/1985 to 01/07/197AD |
03 |
Mr. Bimal Kanti Barua |
03/06/198 to 31/01/1990AD |
04 |
Mr. AKM Khorshed Alam |
03/02/1990 to 01/08/1992AD |
05 |
Mr. Fakhrul Islam |
01/08/1992 to 30/06/1994AD |
07 |
Mr. Pankaj Chandra Das |
14/08/1994 to 08/08/1996AD |
07 |
Mr. Md. Ashraf Ali |
08/08/1998 to 13/08/1998AD |
07 |
Mr. Shams Uddin Ahmed |
02/08/1998 to 04/01/2001AD |
09 |
Mr. Md. Billal Hossain |
01/01/2001 to 06/08/2001AD |
10 |
Mr. Md. Shahnewaz |
08/08/2001 to 26/12/2001AD |
11 |
Mr. Muhammad Maksudur Rahman |
08/01/2002 to 02/05/2004AD |
12 |
Mr. Shabbir Hossain (Acting) |
18/05/2004 to 19/08/2004AD |
13 |
Mr. Dear Jyoti Khisa |
19/07/2004 to 18/04/2008AD |
14 |
Mr. Mohammad Nurul Alam Chowdhury |
12/04/2008 to 26/11/2008 AD |
15 |
Mr. Abu Ahmad Siddiqui |
29/11/2008 to 26/07/2008 AD |
16 |
Mr. Rezwanur Rahman |
31/07/2008 to 12/04/2009 AD |
16 |
Mr. Md. Mokhlesur Rahman Akand |
12/04/2009 to 26/03/2010 AD |
16 |
Mr. Vijay Krishna Debnath |
26/03/2010 to 30/04/2012 AD |
19 |
Mr. Mohammad Khorshed Alam Khan |
30/04/2012 to 01/09/2013 AD |
20 |
Mr. Mohammad Azizur Rahman |
01/09/2013 to 29/09/2013 AD |
21 |
Mr. A.N.M. Nazim Uddin |
29/09/2013 to 26/07/2015AD |
22 |
Mr. Fazlul Zahid Pavel |
13/09/2015 to 22/10/2018 AD |
23 |
Mr. Imrul Hasan |
22/10/2018 to 11/10/2020 AD |
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS